Dekle et al v. Global Digital Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian A. Dekle and John Ramsay
Defendant: Global Digital Solutions, Inc., North American Custom Specialty Vehicles, Inc. and Richard J. Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2015cv00069
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/30/2015. (tgw)
September 14, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer to the second amended complaint are due by 9/28/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/14/2015. (tgw)
June 5, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 14 MOTION to Dismiss or for Transfer of Venue. The plaintiff is ordered to file a Second Amended Complaint by 6/15/2015. Defendants' answer is due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/5/2015. (tgw)
March 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order finding as moot the 10 MOTION for Leave to Add Richard Sullivan as Party Defendant. Richard Sullivan has been properly joined as defendant, per the 9 Amended Complaint, without the need to obtain leave of court. The 5 MOTION to Dis miss filed by North American Custom Specialty Vehicles, Inc., Global Digital Solutions, Inc. are moot. Answer to Amended Complaint due from Global Digital Solutions, Inc. & North American Custom Specialty Vehicles, Inc. on 3/17/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/3/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dekle et al v. Global Digital Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Dekle
Represented By: Richard E. Davis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ramsay
Represented By: Richard E. Davis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Digital Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Custom Specialty Vehicles, Inc.
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?