Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company v. D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham et al

Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham and Chris Saddler
Case Number: 1:2015cv00071
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 107 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Assurance Company of America. Plaintiff's claims for declaratory judgment against Assurance are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Assurance as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/5/2016. (tgw)
December 1, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 90 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationwide Insurance Company. Plaintiff's claims for declaratory judgment against Nationwide are dismissed without prejudice. The MOTION to Consolidate (Doc. 111) is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate Nationwide Insurance Company as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/1/2015. (tgw)
October 14, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/14/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company v. D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger S. Morrow(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joel H. Pearson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham
Represented By: William Bradley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Saddler
Represented By: Michael K. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?