Kirksey v. Schindler Elevator Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Tyra Kirksey
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation and Sears Roebuck and Co.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00115
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/6/2016. (tgw)
October 28, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion to Reconsider Summary Judgment Order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/28/2016. (tgw)
September 21, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Motion to Strike opinions and testimony of Rodowicz; granting 100 Motion to Strike opinions and and opinions of surveillance video and portions of police report; granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Strike opinion and testimony of Davis Turner as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/20/2016. (cmj)
June 7, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Strike ; denying 77 Motion for Oral Argument; denying 80 Motion for D iscovery. Plaintiff's claims against Fictitious Parties 1-10 are dismissed. For reasons as set out, the Alabama Attorney General may intervene in this action within 60 days. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/7/2016. Copy mailed to Alabama Attorney General. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirksey v. Schindler Elevator Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyra Kirksey
Represented By: Gregory Austin Brockwell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Jaime C. Erdberg(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John Chas. Pierce(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin Charles Schiferl(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Blake N Shelby(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Jaime C. Erdberg(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John Chas. Pierce(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin Charles Schiferl(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Blake N Shelby(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?