Williams v. Wintzell's Oyster House

Plaintiff: Raven Williams and D'Andre Wilkerson
Defendant: Wintzell's Oyster House, Robert W. Omainsky, Wintzells, Inc. and Fried, Stewed, Nude, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00123
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2017 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 143 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. The settlement of plaintiffs' FLSA claims is approved as fair and reasonable. Order granting 144 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of opt-in plaintiff Dominique Williams asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/2017. (nah)
January 21, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Curative Provision in the Notice; denying 85 Motion to Strike. The parties are ordered to submit a proposed form of notice for approval by 2/11/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/21/2016. (tgw)
December 3, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 60 & 74 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Compel Mediation/Arbitration. Both Motions are denied insofar as they seek outright dismissal of the claims. All claims brought in this litigation by plaintiffs Courtney B ooth, Morgan Wade, Allison Odom, Dante Henry, Christina Guess, Stormy Lord and Rebecca Glynn Smith are STAYED pending the results of mediation/arbitration. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report by 1/7/2016 & on the first Thursday of each month. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/3/2015. (tgw)
November 24, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 69 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement. The proposed settlement of plaintiffs' claims against defendant Wintzell's, Inc. is approved (Wintzells, Inc. terminated as defendant). The 66 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification is granted. Sur-Reply due by 12/3/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/24/2015. (tgw)
July 1, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement & 13 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Answer due from Defendants Fried, Stewed, Nude, Inc., Robert W. Omainsky & Wintzells, Inc. on 7/15/2015. If Wintzell's Oyster House has yet to appear by 7/20/2015, plaintiff must file an application for default or an appropriate motion or stipulation dismissing that defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/1/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wintzell's Oyster House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Williams
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Represented By: Jon C. Goldfarb
Represented By: Rachel Lee McGinley
Represented By: Lachlan William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Wilkerson
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Represented By: Jon C. Goldfarb
Represented By: Rachel Lee McGinley
Represented By: Lachlan William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintzell's Oyster House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Omainsky
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintzells, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Ryan Brown
Represented By: Albert L. Vreeland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fried, Stewed, Nude, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?