Delta Towing, LLC

Plaintiff: Delta Towing, LLC
Defendant: Gulf Coast Marine, LLC
Claimant: Billy Lee
Case Number: 1:2015cv00128
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Motion to Dismiss the Rule 14(c) Tender. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/7/2016. (cmj)
May 10, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion to Amend Complaint. Lee to file his first amended complaint by 5/23/16. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/10/2016. (cmj)
October 26, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 57 , 61 , 62 ) are GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant Mike Hooks, Inc., as the Owner of the M/V Nicholas, Petition for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability is DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction since the petition was untimely filed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/26/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 2, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Intervene as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/2/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Towing, LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Graham(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Billy Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Huey
Represented By: Wesley K. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Marine, LLC
Represented By: Rufus C. Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?