KeyBank, National Association v. Clarke County Healthcare LLC et al

Plaintiff: KeyBank, National Association
Defendant: Clarke County Healthcare LLC and Resurgence Health Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00151
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Clarke
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of KeyBank, National Association against Resurgence Health Group LLC; in favor of KeyBank, National Association against Clarke County Healthcare LLC. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/21/2016. (Judgment mailed as directed - Clarke County Healthcare 70151730000194038904; Resurgence 7015173000019408898) (cmj)
January 21, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 40 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Defendant Clarke County Healthcare LLC, 34 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Clarke County Healthcare LLC and 37 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees to Motio n for Default Judgment. DEFAULT JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Clarke County Healthcare, LLC for its breach of the Master Lease Agreement, in the amount of $105,301.83 (comprised of $98,487.08 (the amounts due and owing under the Guarantys terms), $5,857.00 in attorneys fees, and $957.75 in costs).. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/21/2016. (cmj)
January 12, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 37 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees to Motion for Default Judgment filed by KeyBank, National Association, as to Clarke County Healthcare, as set out. Miscellaneous deadline set for 1/19/2016 for plaintiff to file an Amended Supplement, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/11/2016. (cmj)
December 10, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 34 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Clarke County Healthcare LLC filed by KeyBank, National Association insofar as default judgment is entered in its favor and against Clarke as to the breach of contract claim in the amount of $98,487.08; and ruling is reserved in part as to specific amount of accrued interest and the request of fees and costs/expenses. Plaintiff is ordered to file by 12/31/15 a supplement to its motion and costs/expenses as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/10/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyBank, National Association v. Clarke County Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank, National Association
Represented By: Daniel C. Fleming(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarke County Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgence Health Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?