Williams v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Williams
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2015cv00164
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability; denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment as to damages. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/23/2016. (tgw)
October 7, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to certify a question of law to the Alabama Supreme Court. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/7/2015. (tgw)
July 30, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/30/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Williams
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Robert Ryan Daugherty(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?