Accident Insurance Company v. Greg Kennedy Builder, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: Greg Kennedy Builder, Inc. and Edgar Benitez
Case Number: 1:2015cv00306
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 34 Motion to Dismiss or Stay. The motion to dismiss is denied and the motion to stay is granted in part denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/29/2016. (tgw)
October 19, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 30 Second Amended Complaint & 31 Brief. The Court concludes that damages would exceed $75,000 and that subject matter jurisdiction exists. Should the defendants wish to dispute the Court's conclusion, a motion to remand is due by 10/30/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/19/2015. (tgw)
August 20, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 17 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/20/2015. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Insurance Company v. Greg Kennedy Builder, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Kee, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Pound Martin(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kennedy Builder, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Philip Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?