Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP et al v. Zurich American Insurance Co. et al

Plaintiff: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Kelvin Hill
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, S&S Sprinkler, LLC and Michele Southerland
Case Number: 1:2015cv00342
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2016 459 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: The plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted to the extent it seeks a ruling that National's exposure is not limited by the provisions discussed. National's motion for summary judgment is denied to the extent it seeks a ruling that its exposure is so limited. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/2016. (tgw)
November 23, 2016 447 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 418 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's denial of National's motion to compel. The Magistrate's denial as to Request for Production 14 is REVERSED with respect to MSA and is otherwise affirmed. Plaintiffs are ordered to produce the MSA by 11/30/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/23/2016. (tgw)
October 5, 2016 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 373 Motion to Reconsider and denying the Motion for Leave to File Renewed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/5/2016. (tgw)
September 23, 2016 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 245 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/23/2016. (srd)
August 19, 2016 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 272 & 277 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The motions are granted with respect to the settlement amount. The 292 Motion to Seal Document is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/19/2016. (tgw)
April 26, 2016 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 126 & 129 Motion to Bifurcate and to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/26/2016. (tgw)
April 25, 2016 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 , 105 , 183 , 184 Motions to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to stay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/25/2016. (tgw)
April 21, 2016 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/21/2016. (tgw)
November 19, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 61 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint & 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Kelvin Hill. Plaintiff is ordered by 11/24/2015 to file an amended complaint setting forth subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/19/2015. (tgw)
November 4, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that adequately sets forth subject matter jurisdiction by 11/18/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/4/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP et al v. Zurich American Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Represented By: Sarah Bond Dorger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Hill
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Represented By: Sarah Bond Dorger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Howard K. Glick
Represented By: Lindsey Paige Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Michelle Leigh Crunk
Represented By: John W. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S Sprinkler, LLC
Represented By: Stanley A. Cash
Represented By: John Dearman Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Southerland
Represented By: Robert Latimer Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?