Coleman v. Unum Group Corporation

Plaintiff: Paul Michael Coleman
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00367
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 114 Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/28/2016. (tgw)
September 16, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Plaintiff's bad faith claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/16/2016. (tgw)
August 15, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Compel plaintiff to authorize release of Social Security Records; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Determine sufficiency and/or Compel; granting 87 Motion for Leave to File discovery motion out of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/15/2016. (srr)
September 9, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/9/2015. (mbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Unum Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Michael Coleman
Represented By: Forrest S. Latta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Represented By: Kristen S. Cross
Represented By: James Sarven Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?