Lynam et al v. Alabama Department of Post Secondary Education

Plaintiff: John Lynam and Bishop State Community College
Defendant: Alabama Department of Post-Secondary Education
Case Number: 1:2015cv00378
Filed: July 28, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Dfts' 66 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part as set out, & Dfts' 68 Motion to Retax Costs is GRANTED as set out. Dfts are entitled to an award of attorneys' fees in the amount of $44,891.50 & costs in the amount of $1,660.80, for a total award of $46,552.30 as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/5/2017. (tot)
November 4, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts Alabama Community College System, Bishop State Community College against Plf John Lynam, & this case is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Costs are taxed against Plf. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/4/2016. (tot)
December 1, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bishop State Community College & Alabama Department of Post-Secondary Education is GRANTED, & Count I of Plf's complaint & the punitive damages demand in Count II of the complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/1/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynam et al v. Alabama Department of Post Secondary Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lynam
Represented By: Steven L. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bishop State Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Post-Secondary Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?