Computer Programs and Systems, Inc. et al v. Wazu Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Computer Programs and Systems, Inc. and Evident, LLC
Defendant: Wazu Holdings, Inc. and Evident, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00405
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 340 Motion to Retax. The costs are RETAXED in the amount of $34,948.63 in favor of CPSI, as detailed herein. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/11/2019. (nah)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order granting in part and denying in part 117 MOTION to Compel filed by Computer Programs and Systems, Inc., and 118 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Evident, Inc., Wazu Holdings, Ltd. as set out herein. Parties are ordered to notify Court in writing whether the exchange of information resulted in a resolution and the status of the outstanding discovery dispute by no later than 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/26/2017. (srd)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Bifurcate as to discovery. Plaintiffs' request to bifurcate trial is denied at this time. However, Plaintiff may re-file the motion to bifurcate trial after the close of discovery and the resolution of any motions for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/7/2017. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Computer Programs and Systems, Inc. et al v. Wazu Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Computer Programs and Systems, Inc.
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evident, LLC
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wazu Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evident, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?