SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Adams
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Michael Terry Adams
Case Number: 1:2015cv00423
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT, entry of default judgment in favor of Plf SE Property Holdings, LLC & against Dft Michael Terry Adams in the amount of $86,634.14 as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/23/2017. (copy mailed to Dft on 3/24/17) (tot)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING in part SEPH's #20 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment as set out. Judgment is due to be entered against Adams in the amount of $56,931.84 for deficiencies on the Loan. $25,837.87 for attorneys' fees, & $3,864.43 for costs, for a total of $86,634.14 as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/23/2017. (copy mailed to Dft on 3/24/17) Modified on 3/23/2017 (tot).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Michael Terry Adams. Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (eec)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Michael Terry Adams by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Plaintiff SE Property Holding, LLC's, Motion to Reinstate, (Doc. 18), is hereby GRANTED, the stay in this matter, (Doc. 13), is hereby LIFTED, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to return this matter to the active docket. Further, since an entry of default has been entered against the Defendant, Plaintiff shall file its motion for a default judgment not later than February 8, 2017 or otherwise file its suggestions as to the contents of an appropriate scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/25/2017. (eec)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Reopen Case Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley Swink Fincher terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/15/2016. (eec)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Ashley Swink Fincher to Withdraw as Attorney by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Fincher, Ashley)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order entered, The Court hereby modifies its previous order and accordingly ORDERS the Defendant to file his first report reflecting the status of his bankruptcy case no later than February 29, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/27/2016. Copy mailed to Defendant Michael Terry Adams (eec)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE. The Defendant is ORDERED to notify the Court in writing within seven (7) calendar days of either the issuance of relief from the automatic stay or the dismissal or other cessation of the bankruptcy proceedings. To keep the Court apprised as to the bankruptcy proceedings, the Defendant is further ORDERED to file a written report reflecting the status of his bankruptcy case every 90 days, with the first such report due on January 26, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/30/2015. (eec)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Michael Terry Adams by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/8/2015. (eec)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Terry Adams for failure to plead or otherwise defend. Copy mailed to Defendant. (eec)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's Entry of Default by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Danielle Mashburn-Myrick, #2 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default) (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Michael Terry Adams served on 8/27/2015, answer due 9/17/2015 (Fincher, Ashley)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Fincher, Ashley)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Swink Fincher on behalf of SE Property Holdings, LLC (Fincher, Ashley)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ida Danielle Mashburn-Myrick on behalf of SE Property Holdings, LLC (Mashburn-Myrick, Ida)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Terry Adams. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC (Fincher, Ashley)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Terry Adams ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1783806, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D) (Fincher, Ashley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2015: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Ida Danielle Mashburn-Myrick
Represented By: Ashley Swink Fincher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Terry Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?