PNC Bank v. Classic Crab, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank
Defendant: Classic Crab, Inc. and Daryl B. Bryant
Case Number: 1:2015cv00459
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment against the Defendant Daryl Bryant in the amount of $241,661.54, which is comprised of the guaranteed debt of $230,263.24, $6,637.05 in additionally accrued interest, and $4,761.25 in attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/11/2016. (srd)
June 6, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank against Classic Crab, Inc. in the amount of $230,263.24. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/6/2016. (copy mailed to Daryl Bryant) (cmj)
April 19, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Default Judgment as follows: Granted as to its claim for breach of promissory note, but with leave to supplement as to its request for attorney's fees; and denied as to its request fo r future accruals of court costs. Plaintiff shall supplement its motion as directed above on or before 4/28/16. The court will then assess the full amount of damages due to PNC due to Classic Crab's breach of the promissory note, and issue a separate order any any appropriate judgment as to the same.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/18/2016. (copy mailed to Bryant) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank v. Classic Crab, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank
Represented By: T. Julian Motes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: George M. Neal, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: C. Lee Reeves(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Crab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl B. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?