Caffey v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Jason A. Caffey
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2015cv00490
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff's amended motion for attorney's fees is GRANTED in the amount of $42,895.25, to be paid from the recovered past-due benefits of plaintiff and his 3 children. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/5/19. (srr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 28 Order the Court finds the 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jason A. Caffey is untimely; plaintiff's counsel is given until 12/13/2018 to file a motion showing sufficient grounds to excuse the tardy filing of his § 406(b) motion; if no motion is filed by that date, Lassiter's motion (doc. 27) will be summarily denied as untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/6/18. (srr)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees is GRANTED in the amount of $3,520.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/6/2017. (srr)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 19 JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date reversing the Commissioner's final decision. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff Jason A. Caffey and against the Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/28/2016. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caffey v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. Caffey
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?