Smith v. The State of Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles

Plaintiff: Thaddeus D. Smith, Sr.
Defendant: The State of Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Case Number: 1:2015cv00625
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/26/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
March 23, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/23/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 25, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Answer due from Demetria Lewis on 2/8/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/25/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. The State of Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus D. Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?