United States of America vs. James M. Crumb, M.D., et al.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: James M. Crumb, Coastal Neurological Institute, P.C. and Mobility Metabolism and Wellness, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00655
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' requests for myriad alternative forms of relief subsumed within their responses (docs. 103, 104) to the Motion are denied. The Government is to refile its Second Amended Complaint by 9/27/16. Defendants' answers due by 10/11/16. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/23/2016. (mbp)
August 24, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss as further set out; denying 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 82 Motion to Amend/. Defendants Dr. Crumb and MMW's request for oral argument is denied. Defendants are to file answers to the Amended Complaint by 9/6/16. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/16. (mbp)
May 18, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order finding as moot 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James M. Crumb, Mobility Metabolism and Wellness, P.C.; Finding as moot 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Coastal Neurological Institute, P.C.., Defendants must file their answers or Rule 12(b) motions in response to the Amended Complaint by 6/6/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/18/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America vs. James M. Crumb, M.D., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Deidre L. Colson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Crumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Neurological Institute, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobility Metabolism and Wellness, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?