McConnell v. University of South Alabama USA Healthcare Management

Plaintiff: Lizzetta McConnell
Defendant: University of South Alabama USA Healthcare Management
Case Number: 1:2016cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 43 MOTION to Compel Discovery. McConnell must serve full responses to the Defendants First Set of Interrogatoriesand Requests for Production by 2/17/2017 as set out. Clerk is directed to email and mail this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/2/2017. Copies to Plaintiff. (srd)
August 3, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss and denying the Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/3/2016. (tgw)
April 29, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement. The motion for more definite statement is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint by 5/13/2016. The motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/29/2016. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. University of South Alabama USA Healthcare Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizzetta McConnell
Represented By: Brina Ilona Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Alabama USA Healthcare Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?