Cardinal Health 108, LLC v. HemaCare Plus, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Defendant: HemaCare Plus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00079
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting, as set out, 60 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 58(a) . Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/15/2017. (cmj)
May 9, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Hemacare's Motion to Dismiss. As no other claims remain, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/8/2017. (cmj)
January 11, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as set out, in the total amount of $688,920.62 comprised of $667,565.69 (plus interest accruing at the contractual rate) on Cardinal's claim s for breach of contract, account stated and open account; $20,867.50 in attorney's fees; and $487.43 in costs. Defendant Hemacare's claims against Third-Party Janis Spratlin remain pending. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/11/2017. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Health 108, LLC v. HemaCare Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HemaCare Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?