Weaver v. Nhu Tran et al

Plaintiff: Charles Weaver
Defendant: Tai Nhu Tran and Tran Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00102
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 166 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 167 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/24/2017. (tgw)
November 17, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 129 Motion for Reconsideration, construed as an objection to a Magistrate Judges's ruling. The rulings are AFFIRMED. To the extent that the objection can be viewed as a motion for reconsideration, the motion is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/17/2016. (tgw)
May 31, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Substitute Party. Ashley Hill added. Charles Weaver terminated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/31/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Nhu Tran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Weaver
Represented By: William Harper Fagerstrom
Represented By: Thomas Michael McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tai Nhu Tran
Represented By: Natalie Ann Daugherty
Represented By: R. Scott Traweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tran Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Ann Daugherty
Represented By: R. Scott Traweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?