Thomas v. Tyus

Plaintiff: Damian J. Thomas
Defendant: Kenneth Tyus, Karl Nelson and Wanda Lightening
Case Number: 1:2016cv00105
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute and obey the Court's Order. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 7/15/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (srd)
April 25, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 6 Order to Pay Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension to pay the partial fee of $44.96 by 5/25/2016. Disposition Deadline set to 5/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/25/2016. copy of this order and 6 order mailed to plaintiff. (sdb)
March 11, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. Deadline set to 4/11/2016 for plaintiff to file this Court's form for a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and to pay the $400.00 filing fee or, in lieu thereof, to file this Court's motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/11/2016. copy of Order and forms mailed as directed. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Tyus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tyus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Lightening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?