Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC v. Converteam SAS

Plaintiff: Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, Pohjola Insurance Limited, AIG Europe Limited, Tapiola General Mutual Insurance Company, AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance SA UK Branch, HDI Gerling UK Branch, MSI Corporate Capital Ltd and Royal & Sun Alliance PLC
Defendant: Converteam SAS
Case Number: 1:2016cv00378
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Compel Arbitration and the claims of the Insurers are referred for arbitration in accordance with the terms of the Supply Agreements. Accordingly, GE's motion to dismiss is granted and the Clerk is directed to close this action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/3/2017. (cmj)
January 30, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to Supplement; granting 6 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Accordingly OTK, Sompo and GE are referred for arbitration in accordance with the terms of the Supply Agreements. Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is Granted. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/30/2017. (cmj)
December 22, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Converteam SAS, 34 MOTION to Remand filed by AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance SA UK Branch, Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, HDI Ger ling UK Branch, Tapiola General Mutual Insurance Company, MSI Corporate Capital Ltd, AIG Europe Limited, Royal & Sun Alliance PLC, Pohjola Insurance Limited, and 35 MOTION to Remand to State Court or, in the Alternative, Motion for Lea ve to Take Limited Discovery Regarding the Alleged "Agreement for Consortial Cooperation" and Incorporated Supporting Brief filed by Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC. The Motions to Remand (34 & 35) are denied and the Motion to Dismiss (7) is denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/22/2016. (cmj)
August 10, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 the motion to stay briefing and consideration of the Defendants pending motions. The Court will extend to plaintiffs the opportunity to file replies to the defendants responses in opposition to the motions to remand/replies in support of the pending motions due by 9/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/10/2016. (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC v. Converteam SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: David Gerard Wanhatalo
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pohjola Insurance Limited
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Europe Limited
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tapiola General Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance SA UK Branch
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Gerling UK Branch
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSI Corporate Capital Ltd
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal & Sun Alliance PLC
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converteam SAS
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?