First Community Bank v. M/V MISS ANNA et al

Plaintiff: First Community Bank
Defendant: M/V MISS ANNA, James N. Skinner, Suzanne P. Skinner and Skinner Pile Driving, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00403
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Default Judgment as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/10/2017. (nah)
December 15, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 38 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by First Community Bank. Plaintiff is ordered to file a supplemental memorandum by 1/5/2017. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/15/2016. (tgw)
October 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Decree Ordering Sale of Vessel, directing that the M/V MISS ANNA be sold by the U. S. Marshal on November 17, 2016, after publication in the Press Register as set out. Plaintiff is responsible for furnishing the Clerk with an appropriate form of Writ of Venditioni Exponas. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/25/2016. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Community Bank v. M/V MISS ANNA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Community Bank
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas Justice Radcliff(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MISS ANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James N. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne P. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skinner Pile Driving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?