Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: |
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Stormey D. Burroughs Jackson, Marcia L. Burrell, Sherita N. Burrell and Andrews Funeral Home |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00411 |
Filed: |
August 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R. Butler |
Referring Judge: |
Bert W. Milling |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
90
JUDGMENT and ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS. Judgment entered in favor of Stormey D. Burroughs Jackson against Marcia L. Burrell and Sherita N. Burrell. The Clerk is directed to disburse the interpleaded funds as set out in Order. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/04/2018. (mab)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER, GRANTING IN PART 72 Motion to Strike the affidavits of Marcia Burrell, Sherita Burell, and Shirley Ross Brooks; GRANTING 64 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Stormey D. Burroughs Jackson; and DENYING the 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Marcia Burrell and Sherita Burrell. Designation of the distribution of the interpleaded funds, and Judgment will be entered by separate order. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 05/31/2018. (mab)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
37
Order GRANTING Dft Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's 32 Motion for Leave to Interplead Funds. Within 30 days after the date of this Order, MetLife is to deposit benefit funds of $59,500.00, plus any applicable interest due under the terms of the Plan, into the Registry of the Court for subsequent disbursement to one or more of the interpleader dfts in accordance w/the judgment of this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS MetLife from this action W/PREJUDICE & discharge it, C hrysler, & the Plan from liability as to any claims relating to the Plan. The interpleader dfts are permanently enjoined from instituting or prosecuting any other action or proceeding against in any state or United States court against MetLife or an y subsidiary or related companies, Chrysler, or the Plan, for the recovery of the Plan benefits. MetLife is entitled to recover reasonable attnys' fees & disbursements expended in this matter. Following the interpleader of the funds, MetLife is to file appropriate proof of its attny fees & disbursements. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/21/2016. (copies mailed to Dfts M. Burrell & S. Burrell on 12/22/16) (tot) Modified on 12/22/2016 (tot).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?