Betts v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Betts
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00442
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that Bett's claim against Safeco is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and unless Progressive files an objection by 10/27/17, Betts' claim against Progressive is dismissed. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 10/27/2017.). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/16/17. (cmj)
August 3, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 73 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and 74 Appellant's Brief filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. Berkleys appeal is DENIED and the Magistrate Judges decision is AFFIRMED as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/3/2017. (srd)
March 10, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File; granting 25 Motion for Leave to File; granting 28 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendants shall file their amended answers on or before 3/24/17. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/10/2017. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Betts
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Kenneth Albert Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: John Evans Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?