Smith v. City Of Mobile et al

Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Defendant: City Of Mobile, Mobile County Personnel Board, Sandy Stimpson and Donald Dees
Case Number: 1:2016cv00478
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Stimpson's Motion for Summary Judgment as to remaining federal claims against him in Counts I and III, which are dismissed with prejudice, all remaining state law claims in this action are dismissed without prejudice; the p ending 58 , 59 Motions for Summary Judgment are moot to the extent they are not otherwise disposed of in order. The final pretrial conference and all remaining deadlines are canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/12/17. (srr)
September 26, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; summary judgment under FRCP 56(f) is DENIED as to federal claims in Counts I and III against Sandy Stimpson related to Smith's pre-termination proceedings, is otherwi se GRANTED in favor of Stimpson as to federal claims asserted in Counts I and III. This order does not dispose of any claims under "Alabama Statutory Law" asserted in Count III. The pending motion for summary judgment 50 is MOOT as to Cou nt V and the federal claims in Count IV as they have been dismissed by previous order. The motion for summary judgment 50 is MOOT to the extend Dees seeks qualified immunity on all remaining federal claims against him. The motion is DENIED to the extent Barnett seeks to dismiss any pending state law claims against her based on "official capacity immunity" for reasons stated in 8/15/17 order 51 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/26/17. (srr)
August 15, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donald Dees, ( Responses to this order showing cause why summary judgment should not be entered in favor of all defendants on the federal claims asserted in Counts I and III, with all remaining state law claims then dismissed without prejudice under 28:1367(c)(3) due by 8/29/2017, Replies due by 9/5/2017, Motion to be taken under submission on 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/15/2017. (srr)
July 5, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; motion to dismiss Count IV is GRANTED as to federal claims in Count IV of the complaint, which are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and is otherwise DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal of state law claims asserted in Count IV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/5/2017. (srr)
January 27, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss Count V of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/27/2017. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City Of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Carroll James Ogden
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Personnel Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Stimpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?