U S Incorporated v. TUG SEGUIN et al

Plaintiff: U S Incorporated
Defendant: TUG SEGUIN, Hartley Marine Services, Inc. and Clearview Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00530
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Entry of Default; granting 35 Motion to Supplement; the Clerk is directed to enter default against the Vessel; it is ORDERED that by 7/17/17 Plaintiff is to file a request or motion for default judgment against the Vessel or show cause why it is unable to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/23/2017. (srr)
June 9, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that by 6/19/2017 plaintiff is to file a request for entry of default against defendants Hartley and TUG SUGUIN or show cause for its inability to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/9/2017. (srr)
January 9, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 21 Motion to Supplementappointment of substitute custodian. Plaintiff U.S. Incorporated is appointed as substitute custodian of the vessel TUG SEGUIN, Official No. 1105173. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/9/2017. copy to USM (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U S Incorporated v. TUG SEGUIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U S Incorporated
Represented By: Ray M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUG SEGUIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartley Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?