United States of America v. Approximately $299,873.70 seized from a Bank of America Account et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $299,873.70 seized from a Bank of America Account, Approximately $191,260.60 seized from a Bank of America Account, Approximately $299,945.00 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $299,970.00 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $249,927.14 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $297,110.00 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $278,952.11 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $12,367.82 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $249,816.00 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $281,110.00 seized from an East West Bank Account, Approximately $299,985.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $299,852.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $76,604.55 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $300,000.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $299,983.49 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $199,907.52 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account, Approximately $149,759.17 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account and Approximately $299,000.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Case Number: 1:2016cv00545
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying 232 Motion to Dismiss; denying 244 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/14/2019. (khc)
October 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER denying at this time 216 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 217 Motion in Limine; granting 218 Motion in Limine; Carrying to Trial 219 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 220 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/12/2019. (khc)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Default Judgment of Forfeiture entered as to Pan Qiang. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/06/2019. (nah)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Default Judgment of Forfeiture entered as to Zuowu Xie. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/12/2019. (nah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $299,873.70 seized from a Bank of America Account et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher John Bodnar
Represented By: Donna Barrow Dobbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,873.70 seized from a Bank of America Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $191,260.60 seized from a Bank of America Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,945.00 seized from an East West Bank Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,970.00 seized from an East West Bank Account
Represented By: Neil L. Hanley
Represented By: Neil Stewart Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $249,927.14 seized from an East West Bank Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $297,110.00 seized from an East West Bank Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $278,952.11 seized from an East West Bank Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $12,367.82 seized from an East West Bank Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $249,816.00 seized from an East West Bank Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $281,110.00 seized from an East West Bank Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,985.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,852.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $76,604.55 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $300,000.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,983.49 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $199,907.52 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $149,759.17 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $299,000.00 seized from a J.P. Morgan Chase Account
Represented By: Robert Gary Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?