Jones v. Coty, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Shamika Jones |
Defendant: |
Coty, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Co., Inc., The Procter & Gamble Distributing, L.L.C., Procter and Gamble Hair Care, L.L.C. and The Procter & Gamble Company, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00622 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
Sonja F. Bivins |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 7, 2019 |
Filing
194
ORDER, 193 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) is construed as a motion for court order of dismissal, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2). The motion is GRANTED as modified. All of Plf Bowen's individua l claims against Dfts Coty, Inc.; The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Co., Inc.; The Procter & Gamble Distributing, L.L.C.; Procter and Gamble Hair Care, L.L.C.; & The Procter & Gamble Company, Inc., are DISMISSED w/prejudice, w/each party to bear their own costs. The class claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/7/19. (tot)
|
March 18, 2019 |
Filing
187
Order, Plf's 143 MOTION to Certify Class & 145 MOTION to Appoint Class Counsel are DENIED as moot w/leave to reassert using the new proposed definition as set out. Plf's motions pertaining to the class request & class counsel are due o n or before 4/12/2019. Any response from Dfts shall be filed on or before 4/26/2019, w/any reply from Plf due on or before 5/3/2019. Plf is DIRECTED to confer w/Dfts regarding exhibits that may be subject to the protective order & determine what m atters they can agree are subject to the common-law right of access to judicial proceedings. Briefing on any matters either party or both parties wish to be filed under seal shall be due on or before 4/1/2019. All prior documents placed under seal will remain under seal, & Plf's 133 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal, 177 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/18/19. (tot)
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing
184
Order PROVISIONALLY GRANTING 133 MOTION for leave to Seal Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Class Certification Brief Under Seal. Parties are ORDERED to file by 3/20/2019 any brief in support of motion to file under seal as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 03/12/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
|
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
170
ORDER: Plaintiff Brianna Franks' Class Action Complaint is dismissed without prejudice to her ability to refile in state court. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/2/2018. (tgw)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Filing
166
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and obey the Court's orders. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/21/2018. Copy mailed to Shamika Jones. (tgw)
|
April 27, 2018 |
Filing
112
Order re: the 97 Objection the Magistrate Judge's order granting thedefendants an extension of time within which to make their Rule 26(a)(2)disclosures. The Order is affirmed. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/27/2018. (tgw)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 16-622-WS-B, Member Case No.: 17-192-MU, All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract document 20 in 17-0192-MU and to make the documents a part of this file. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/16/2017. (tgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?