Matthews et al v. Ankor Energy, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Hooper W. Matthews, III, Dale M. Ash, Cindy M. Colville, Jerry M. Kelly, Sr., Lauren Luczkow, Kelly Properties, L.L.P. and K&L Resources, LLP
Defendant: Ankor Energy, LLC, Ankor E&P Holdings Corp. and GSE&R America Offshore, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00062
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order entered. Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 1/2/2020 properly alleging citizenship of all parties. Defendants are to file answers to amended complaint not later than 14 days after service. The pretrial conference and jury selection are cancelled and pretrial disclosure deadlines are stayed pending further order of court. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/11/19. (cmj)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 38 Report and Recommendation with MODIFICATION as set out in Order. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 24 & 26 ) are DENIED in their entirety. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/13/2018. (mab)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss & the 11 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/1/2017. Copies to parties. (mpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews et al v. Ankor Energy, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hooper W. Matthews, III
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Represented By: James Eric Brisendine
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale M. Ash
Represented By: James Eric Brisendine
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy M. Colville
Represented By: James Eric Brisendine
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry M. Kelly, Sr.
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Luczkow
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Properties, L.L.P.
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Represented By: James Eric Brisendine
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&L Resources, LLP
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Represented By: James Eric Brisendine
Represented By: Elbert Allen Dodd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankor Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankor E&P Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSE&R America Offshore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?