Walker v. The City of Mobile et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Walker
Defendant: The City of Mobile and Mobile Police Department
Case Number: 1:2017cv00117
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/21/2017. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting 11 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by The City of Mobile, Mobile Police Department. This action is dismissed without prejudice as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/13/2017. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (nah)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting 2 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Definite Statement filed by The City of Mobile, Mobile Police Department, as further set out. Plaintiff is ordered to file a Second Amended Complaint by 5/5/2017, as set out. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading to Second Amended Complaint must be filed by 5/19/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/18/2017. (Copy of order and Pro Se Litigant Guide mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. The City of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Mobile
Represented By: Emily A. Crow
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Police Department
Represented By: Emily A. Crow
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?