Diehl v. The Money Source Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anastasia P. Diehl
Defendant: The Money Source Inc., Loancare, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc. and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00125
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2018 131 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Loancare, LLC. All Claims asserted against Loancare are dismissed with prejudice (Loancare, LLC terminated as Defendant). The 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Money Source Inc. is granted in part denied in part. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/13/2018. (tgw)
April 18, 2018 116 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 99 Unopposed Motion for leave to Seal Document. The exhibits found at docs 90 & 95 will remain SEALED. Defendants' redacted exhibits are to be filed by 5/1/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/18/2018. (tgw)
March 16, 2018 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Consolidate and Extend Certain Scheduling Order Dealines; denying 85 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/16/2018. (tgw)
March 14, 2018 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 99 Unopposed MOTION for leave to Seal Document. Defendants are ordered to file a supplemental memorandum by 3/28/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2018. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diehl v. The Money Source Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia P. Diehl
Represented By: James Donnie Patterson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Money Source Inc.
Represented By: Amanda McGregor Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loancare, LLC
Represented By: Danielle K. Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leilus Jackson Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?