Nail et al v. Shipp et al
Plaintiff: |
Jordin Ballard, Richard Boyette, April R. Nail and Mark L. Hopper |
Defendant: |
Robert M. Shipp, Regina E. Shipp and Sportsman Fish House, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00195 |
Filed: |
May 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
Sonja F. Bivins |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristi K. DuBose |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 28, 2021 |
Filing
352
Order re: 351 NOTICE of Satisfaction and MOTION for Cancellation of Judgment. The Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Robert Shipp, Regina Shipp, and Sportsman Fish House, LLC, has been PAID IN FULL and has been FULLY SATISFIED by said Defendants as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED TO DESIGNATE the Judgment as such on the record. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 01/28/2021. (srd)
|
December 14, 2020 |
Filing
347
Order GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 313 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Playa, LLC, C. Bennett Long, Fisher's at Orange Beach Marina, LLC. The Interpleaders motion to discharge is GRANTED and they are DISMISSED from this case. The Motion is DENIED as to the request for entry of Section 2361 Injunction as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/14/2020. (srd)
|
June 23, 2020 |
Filing
254
Order DENYING 233 Plaintiffs' Exparte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. It is ORDERED that Defendants Robert M. Shipp, Regina E. Shipp, and Sportsman Fish House, LLC are hereby PROHIBITED for 60 days from transferring, assigning, and/ or selling any asset to any entity which Robert M. Shipp, Regina E. Shipp, or any family member, has an interest in, is a beneficiary of, is a member of, and/or controls in any manner. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/23/2020. (nah) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nah).
|
June 14, 2020 |
Filing
234
Order re: 233 Exparte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion will be HELD IN ABEYANCE to allow an opportunity for Defendants to receive notice and an opportunity to be heard. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to give immediate notice by overnight mail to Defendants and Defendants' counsel of their motion and request for a TRO, as well as a copy of this Order no later than 6/16/2020. Defendants are ORDERED to file a Response by 5:00 p.m. on 6/18/2020 . Further, it is ORDERED that a HEARING will be held on this matter on 6/22/2020 at 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602. Matt and/or Regina Shipp are ordered to appear. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/14/2020. (nah)
|
April 3, 2020 |
Filing
221
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/03/2020. (nah)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing
161
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/06/2019. (nah)
|
November 26, 2018 |
Filing
129
ORDER granting 98 MOTION to Withdraw opt-in Plaintiff Jason Brown as set out. Plaintiff Brown and Defendants are to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/26/2018. (srd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?