Carter v. Rudinplay, Inc. Featured Case

The estate of acclaimed writer Harper Lee is suing screenwriter Aaron Sorkin over his adaptation of Lee's novel "To Kill a Mockingbird." The complaint alleges that Sorkin's portrayal of Atticus Finch, the lawyer who represents a black man unjustly accused of rape, makes Finch out to be a naïve apologist for the racial status quo, a depiction Lee's estate argues conflicts with his purely heroic image in the novel.

Plaintiff: Tonja B. Carter
Defendant: Rudinplay, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00117
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 37 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Southern District of New York, Case Number 1:18-cv-04097. (tgw)
May 7, 2018 36 Featured Case ORDER granting in part denying in part the 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the Southern District of New York. The 29 Motion to Strike is moot. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/7/2018. (tgw)
May 1, 2018 REFERRAL OF 33 Reply to Response to Motion, 34 Reply to Response to Motion, 35 Notice of Action by the Southern District of New York to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 30, 2018 35 NOTICE by Rudinplay, Inc. of Action by the Southern District of New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order Setting Trial, # 2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Hearing, # 3 Exhibit C - Scheduling Order) (Prater, Harlan)
April 30, 2018 34 REPLY to Response to Motion 13 filed by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Scott Rudin (with Exhibits A-C)) (Prater, Harlan)
April 30, 2018 33 REPLY to Response to Motion 30 to Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Lembke, Matthew)
April 30, 2018 REFERRAL OF 32 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 27, 2018 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Rudin, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott Rudin, # 3 Exhibit C - Letter Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - March 9, 2018 Letter, # 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jonathan Zavin, # 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jonathan Strauss, # 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Sara Slavin, # 8 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 1), # 9 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 2), # 10 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 3), # 11 Exhibit I - Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 12 Exhibit J - Order to Show Cause, # 13 Exhibit K - Rudinplay's Memorandum of Law, # 14 Exhibit L - Motion for PHV Appearance, # 15 Exhibit M - Carter's Opposition to Expedited Discovery) (Prater, Harlan)
April 24, 2018 31 Order re: 30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter. Responses due by 4/27/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/2018. (tgw)
April 24, 2018 30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Lembke, Matthew)
April 24, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: 29 MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick to Judge Steele (tgw)
April 24, 2018 REFERRAL OF 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 23, 2018 29 MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Lembke, Matthew)
April 10, 2018 27 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 20] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sarah Schacter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw)
April 10, 2018 26 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sara Slavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw)
April 10, 2018 25 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Neil Strauss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw)
April 10, 2018 24 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 17] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Zavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw)
April 10, 2018 23 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Jeffrey M. Anderson; Admission & Registration due within 7 days. (tgw)
April 10, 2018 22 Order re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer. Responses due by 4/23/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/10/2018. (tgw)
April 10, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: 17 MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.), 18 MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.), 19 MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) & 20 MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
April 10, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer to Judge Steele (tgw)
April 10, 2018 21 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 14 filed by Rudinplay, Inc. (Steele, William)
April 9, 2018 20 MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission) (Schacter, Sarah)
April 9, 2018 19 MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission) (slavin, Sara)
April 9, 2018 18 MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission) (Strauss, Jonathan)
April 9, 2018 17 MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission) (Zavin, Jonathan)
April 9, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gordon Thompson, Jr on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc. (Thompson, John)
April 9, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Paul Doss on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc. (Doss, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2018 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rudinplay, Inc.. (Prater, Harlan)
April 9, 2018 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Rudin, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stefan Schick) (Prater, Harlan)
April 6, 2018 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc., filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Lembke, Matthew)
March 20, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonja B. Carter. Rudinplay, Inc. served on 3/17/2018, answer due 4/9/2018 (Lembke, Matthew)
March 16, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Reggie Copeland, Jr. on behalf of Tonja B. Carter (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 3/19/2018 (tgw).
March 14, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibit B (Doc. 4) UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2018. (tgw)
March 14, 2018 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 7 filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Steele, William)
March 13, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew)
March 13, 2018 6 Service Order entered 3/13/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/27/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/13/2018. (tgw)
March 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Rudinplay, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
March 13, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: 3 MOTION for leave to Seal Document & 4 Sealed Document to Judge Steele (tgw)
March 13, 2018 3 MOTION for leave to Seal Document by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lembke, Matthew)
March 13, 2018 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tonja B. Carter (Lembke, Matthew)
March 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2194355, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lembke, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2018: # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Rudinplay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonja B. Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Anderson
Represented By: Reggie Copeland, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Lembke
Represented By: Ellen Presley Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudinplay, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Doss
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Sarah Schacter
Represented By: Sara Adrienne Slavin
Represented By: Jonathan Neil Strauss
Represented By: John Gordon Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Zavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?