d'Amico Dry d.a.c. v. Nikka Finance, Inc.

Plaintiff: d'Amico Dry d.a.c.
Defendant: Nikka Finance, Inc., Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited, Bulknav, Inc., Primebulk Shipmanagement, Ltd., Paul Coronis and Nicholas Coronis
Case Number: 1:2018cv00284
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: P. Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order GRANTING IN PART 203 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c., as set out. D'Amico's motion for attorneys' fees and costs is granted in the amount of $388,340.87. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/09/2019. (nah)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 180 Motion for Increased Security. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/15/2019. (nah)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Order entered on Bench Trial re: 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment is MOOT in light of the fact that the case proceeded to trial; 154 MOTION for Sanctions and Motion in Limine is DENIED; 181 MOTION for Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART. For reasons stated herein, the court finds that Nikka and Primera were alter egos. Nikka is therefore liable for the 2009 English judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/01/2019. (nah)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 123 Motion for Protective Order and d'Amico is authorized to videotape Paul Coronis' deposition on 10/24/2018 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/19/2018. (srd)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order that a telephone conference was held 10/5/18; parties requested an extension until 11/2/18 to make pretrial disclosures; the 107 Scheduling Order is FURTHER MODIFIED; the undersigned RECOMMENDS to Chief Judge DuBose that her submission order incorporate a response date to any motion for summary judgment filed not earlier than 11/5/18; see order as to request for admission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/5/18. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: d'Amico Dry d.a.c. v. Nikka Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: d'Amico Dry d.a.c.
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Beren Segarra
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikka Finance, Inc.
Represented By: William Robert Bennett, III
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Brooke Wilgus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulknav, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primebulk Shipmanagement, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Coronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Coronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?