Ryan v. AT&T, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark D. Ryan
Defendant: AT&T, Inc., AT&T Benefits Center, AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Services, Inc. d/b/a AT&T Benefits Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00315
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Services, Inc., filed by Mark D. Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L) (Ryan, Mark)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mark D. Ryan of Service Status (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from AT&T Services, Inc.) (Ryan, Mark)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 ALIAS Summons Issued as to AT&T Benefits Center. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/17/2018) (tgw).
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mark D. Ryan (Ryan, Mark)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mark D. Ryan as to AT&T Benefits Center. (Ryan, Mark)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on AT&T, Inc. on 7/20/2018, filed by Mark D. Ryan. (Ryan, Mark) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct service date (tgw).
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 This action has been transferred from the docket of Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Please use the letter suffix JB-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Service Notice issued 7/20/2018. Plaintiff's notice of service attempts due by 8/30/2018 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(3). (mab)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to AT&T Benefits Center, AT&T, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mark D. Ryan (Ryan, Mark)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Benefits Center, AT&T, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2250165, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mark D. Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - L, #3 Supplement Interrogatories & Requests for Production) (Ryan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. AT&T, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Benefits Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc. d/b/a AT&T Benefits Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Ryan
Represented By: Samuel K. Wilkes
Represented By: Mark D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?