Jackson, Key and Assocates, L.L.C. v. Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jackson, Key and Assocates, L.L.C. and Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C.
Defendant: Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00322
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/11/2018. (mcb)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #7 Motion to Dismiss; temporarily granting #12 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to dismiss (Doc. 7) not later than October 2, 2018. Any reply to the response must be filed by Defendant no later than October 16, 2018. Discovery in this matter is temporarily stayed pending a conference with counsel after the motion to dismiss has been fully briefed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/11/18. (Cassady, William)
September 11, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Stay RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS AND DISCOVERY Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mcb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS AND DISCOVERY by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Hess, Joshua)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Baker on behalf of Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Baker, Joshua)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C., Albert W. Key, Jr., Russell W. Allbritain identifying Other Affiliate Albert W. Key, Jr., Other Affiliate Russell W. Allbritain for Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C... (Myrick, Joshua)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 09/11/2018. (nah)
September 11, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Hess, Joshua)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Third-Party Petition, #3 Exhibit Policy) (Hess, Joshua)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. on 08/20/2018, filed by Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C.. (Myrick, Joshua)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Alias Summons Issued as to Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C. (Alias Summons) (Myrick, Joshua)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested served on Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. on 7/19/2018, filed by Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C.. (Myrick, Joshua)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2251684, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jackson, Key and Assocates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons) (Myrick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson, Key and Assocates, L.L.C. v. Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Represented By: Joshua B. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson, Key and Assocates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson, Key and Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?