Quality Plus Services, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Plaintiff: Quality Plus Services, Inc.
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00345
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Responses due by 10/5/2018, Replies due by 10/12/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/24/2018. (tgw)
September 24, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim to Judge Steele (tgw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A Contract between Georgia-Pacific and Quality Plus Services, Inc., #3 Exhibit B Purchase Orders between QPS and Vulcan Industrial Contractors Co., LLC, #4 Exhibit C tender correspondence dated August 22, 2017 from Georgia-Pacific to QPS, #5 Exhibit D tender correspondence dated August 28, 2017 from QPS to Vulcan, #6 Exhibit E National Union Policy, number GL 159-53-04) (Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ACE American Insurance Company. (Whitehead, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service- National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA by Quality Plus Services, Inc.. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 8/9/2018, answer due 9/21/2018 (Hamilton, William)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service- ACE American Insurance Company by Quality Plus Services, Inc.. ACE American Insurance Company served on 8/9/2018, answer due 9/21/2018 (Hamilton, William)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Nancy F. Rigby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/4/2018. (tgw)
September 4, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Judge Steele (tgw)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Answer due from ACE American Insurance Company on 9/21/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/31/2018. (tgw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by ACE American Insurance Company. (Pulvere, Graham)
August 31, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Nancy F. Rigby to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2272749, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Nancy F. Rigby to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2272749, Online Credit Card Payment.) by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA on 9/21/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/29/2018. (tgw)
August 27, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Steele (tgw)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ACE American Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Quality Plus Services, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 08/03/2018. (srd)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Quality Plus Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, William)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Quality Plus Services, Inc. Summons to ACE American Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Hamilton, William)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2258654, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Quality Plus Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Hamilton, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Plus Services, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen E. Whitehead
Represented By: Graham R. Pulvere
Represented By: Jennifer W. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Nancy Rigby
Represented By: Nicholas P. Panayotopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Plus Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?