McMillian v. Cooks et al

Petitioner: Alex Demetrius McMillian
Respondent: State Of Alabama, Mary D. Windom, Warden Cooks, Honorable Michael Youngpeter, Alabama Supreme Court and Mary Cooks
Case Number: 1:2018cv00369
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
0 Judge: Bert W Milling
1 Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
3 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 9 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt No. 46031048376. (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 10/17/18) (tot)
October 11, 2018 8 MOTION for Dispositional Status by Alex Demetrius McMillian. (Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson(PSU) on 10/17/18) (tot)
September 28, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Pet's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pet shall remit a money order for $5.00 to the Clerk by 10/29/2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold service until further notification & to refer this action for review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/28/18. (copy mailed to Pet on 9/28/18) (tot)
September 26, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alex Demetrius McMillian. (Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson(PSU) on 9/27/18). (tot)
September 7, 2018 5 Featured Case Order, Pet is to complete & file this Court's form for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, or pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee in lieu of filing the motion, NLT 10/8/2018. Although Pet captioned this action against State of Alabama, Hon. Michael Youngpeter, Mary D. Windom & the Alabama Supreme Court, the officer having custody of the applicant shall be named as Respondent as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/7/18. (copy to Pet w/form on 9/10/18) (tot)
September 5, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (clr)
September 5, 2018 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TM-N after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Petitioner. (clr)
September 4, 2018 3 Case Reassigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. District Judge William H. Steele no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TM-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (tgw)
August 23, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit") by Alex Demetrius McMillian. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr.(PSU) on 8/27/18) (tot)
August 23, 2018 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Alex Demetrius McMillian. (Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr.(PSU) on 8/27/18) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillian v. Cooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary D. Windom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Honorable Michael Youngpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alabama Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Demetrius McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?