Smith v. Flora-Bama Old S.A.L.T.S., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Smith
Defendant: Flora-Bama Marina, Flora-Bama Old S.A.L.T.S., Inc., Chris Nardell and Barry Ingram
Case Number: 1:2018cv00397
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
0 Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
1 Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Smith. All Defendants. (Prestwood, Austin)
September 17, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to All Defendants on 09/14/2018 by William Smith. Waiver of Service due by 10/15/2018. (Prestwood, Austin)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case Service Order entered 9/17/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/29/2018. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/17/2018. (tgw)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2278466, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Prestwood, Austin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Flora-Bama Old S.A.L.T.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Austin Smitherman Prestwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flora-Bama Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flora-Bama Old S.A.L.T.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Nardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?