Whitfield v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Shawanda Whitfield
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00412
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/1/2018 as to Social Security Administration (tgw)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/1/2018 as to U.S. Attorney General (tgw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 9/28/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (tgw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Nicole Beyer on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Beyer, Patricia)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/26/2018. (tgw)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (tgw)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/24/2018. (tgw)
September 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawanda Whitfield. (Thomas, Ashley)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Shawanda Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 Summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawanda Whitfield
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?