Erdman v. Falkner et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr.
Defendant: Carla Williams Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Kirby J. Plessala, Peter T. Falkner, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Innovative Medicine, LLC and Copperhead, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00414
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2018. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses by all defendants to the motion to remand are now due by 11/29/2018 and Plaintiff may file a Reply if it is filed by 12/13/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/8/18. (Cassady, William)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order re: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice of Appearance of Mickey Wright filed by Carla Williams Falkner, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, ( Motion Hearing, by telephone, set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/7/2018. (eec)
November 6, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice of Appearance of Mickey Wright by Carla Williams Falkner, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala. (Wright, Mickey)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Remand. Defendants' Responses are due by 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/16/18. (Cassady, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Tufts, Lucy)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Any response to this motion by the Plaintiff is to be filed not later than October 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/15/18. (Cassady, William)
October 12, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Remand referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Satterwhite, Harry)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order. Any additional response to the Motion to Remand (Doc. 14) by the removing parties shall be filed not later than October 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/4/18. (Cassady, William)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #16 Motion to Stay Discovery. These issues will be revisited once jurisdiction is established. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/4/18. (Cassady, William)
October 3, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Remand, #15 MOTION to Suspend Briefing Schedule, #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Tufts, Lucy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Suspend Briefing Schedule by Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Tufts, Lucy) Modified on 10/3/2018 (tot).
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Tufts, Lucy)
October 2, 2018 REFERRAL OF #13 Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement to Judge Cassady. (tot)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Amended Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Insert Page re Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Insert Page re Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amended Memorandum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Amended Memorandum, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Amended Memorandum) (Satterwhite, Harry) Modified on 10/2/2018 (tot).
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Based upon the confidential nature of the contents of the documents at issue, it is determined that the defendants should file, under seal, the unredacted version of the Non-Disclosure Agreement and the Development Agreement, and such documents shall remain under seal until further Order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 09/24/18. (Cassady, William)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/18. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Blank Disclosure Statement E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC; Disclosure Statements Due 9/28/2018. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
September 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
September 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss, or Alternatively, MOTION for More Definite Statement & #3 MEMORANDUM in Support referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Carla Williams Faulkner, Peter T. Faulkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Carla Williams Faulkner, Peter T. Faulkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Carla Williams Faulkner, Peter T. Faulkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Insert to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Insert to Memorandum) (Sealed exhibits are Docs. 6 & 7 ) (Satterwhite, Harry) Modified on 9/24/2018 (mab).
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss, or Alternatively, MOTION for More Definite Statement by All Defendants. (Satterwhite, Harry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (tot). (Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 9/21/2018) (tot).
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number CV-2018-902181. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2281631, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by All Defendants. (Satterwhite, Harry) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/21/2018) (srd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Exhibit 1) (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erdman v. Falkner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr.
Represented By: William Earl Bonner
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Williams Falkner
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford A. Henricksen
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGEN1, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby J. Plessala
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter T. Falkner
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copperhead, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Mickey B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?