Leach v. Wehling et al
Plaintiff: David Leach
Defendant: Regents Bank, Mary Wehling and Ugene Wehling
Case Number: 1:2018cv00454
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Copy mailed to Plaintiff and Defendants Mary & Ugene Wehling) (nah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mary Wehling. (nah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ugene Wehling. (nah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ugene Wehling served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018 (nah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mary Wehling served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018 (nah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Regents Bank served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018 (nah)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Regents Bank, Mary Wehling, Ugene Wehling. Summons mailed to Plaintiff for service. (nah)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regents Bank, Mary Wehling, Ugene Wehling ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 46031048454, Paid at Intake), filed by David Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Filing Fee Receipt) (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. Wehling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugene Wehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?