Childers v. CSL Financial, LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald Childers
Defendant: CSL Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00457
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Kristi K DuBose
1 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due on or before 1/21/2019, and Defendant's reply is due on or before 1/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/11/18. (lto)
December 11, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing, #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald Childers. (Underwood, Earl)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 On December 7, 2018, Defendant CSL Financial, LLC, filed a #9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's motion on or before December 21, 2018. Defendant is ORDERED to file its reply, if any, on or before December 28, 2018, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/7/18. (lto)
December 7, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CSL Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sipes, Jade)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until December 7, 2018 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/21/18.(gcp)
November 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to Judge Kristi K. DuBose (mcb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CSL Financial, LLC. (Sipes, Jade)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade Eleanor Sipes on behalf of CSL Financial, LLC (Sipes, Jade)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Keith Andress on behalf of CSL Financial, LLC (Andress, D.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Childers. CSL Financial, LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Underwood, Earl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSL Financial, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Proposed Summons by Ronald Childers re: #1 Complaint, (Underwood, Earl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald Childers ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2296056, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Ronald Childers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TILA Disclosure, #2 Exhibit Yield Spread Calculations) (Underwood, Earl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childers v. CSL Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Financial, LLC
Represented By: Jade Eleanor Sipes
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Childers
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?