Chatman v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Chatman
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00475
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth W. Chatman. Attorney General of the United States served on 12/3/18. (Holland, Laura) Modified on 12/3/2018 (tot).
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth W. Chatman. SSA, Office of the General Counsel, served 11/29/19. (Holland, Laura) Modified on 12/3/2018 (tot).
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth W. Chatman. Nancy Berryhill served on 11/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. (Holland, Laura)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/19/18. (tot)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA, Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny). (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2304904, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kenneth W. Chatman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 Summons, #4 summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Chatman
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?