RE/MAX LLC v. Momentum University, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RE/MAX, LLC
Defendant: Jason Will, Diana M. Will and Momentum University, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00484
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 . Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff RE/MAX LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/20/2018. (ctn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RE/MAX, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by RE/MAX LLC (Mathews, Ellen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff RE/MAX LLC. (Mathews, Ellen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs RE/MAX LLC, RMCO, LLC, RE/MAX Holdings Inc., RIHI, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RMCO, LLC, Corporate Parent RE/MAX Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent RIHI, Inc. for RE/MAX LLC.. (Mathews, Ellen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RE/MAX LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2308011, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mathews, Ellen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RE/MAX LLC v. Momentum University, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana M. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum University, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE/MAX, LLC
Represented By: Ellen T. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?