Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Defendant: Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC and Noel Hurtado
Case Number: 1:2018cv00494
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard R. Williams on 12/11/2018 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Waiver of Service due by 1/10/2019. (Gamble, F.) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/17/2019) (nah).
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Status Report #7 filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Steele, William)
January 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Status Report to Judge Steele. (nah)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT on Service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Gamble, F.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 12/4/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/14/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/4/2018. (tgw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC, Noel Hurtado. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Steele, William)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Gamble, F.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Gamble, F.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC, Noel Hurtado ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2312221, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gamble, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cozumel Mexican Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?