Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Wasp Enterprise Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Daryl Wasp and Wasp Enterprise Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2018cv00495
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Status Report to Judge Beaverstock. (nah)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT on Service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Gamble, F.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 12/4/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/4/2018. (tgw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daryl Wasp, Wasp Enterprise Incorporated. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER [TEXT ONLY] on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/30/2018. (ctn)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Gamble, F.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Gamble, F.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daryl Wasp, Wasp Enterprise Incorporated ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2312228, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gamble, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Wasp Enterprise Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Wasp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasp Enterprise Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?