Cruise v. State of Alabama

Plaintiff: Harold David Cruise
Defendant: State of Alabama, Judge Ben Brooks and Steve Marshall
Case Number: 1:2018cv00524
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold service of process until further notification. The #7 Amended Complaint is a duplicate of the #6 Amended Complaint and is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/5/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold David Cruise - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (PSU) (tgw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 (Stricken per the #9 Order) 1983 COMPLAINT against Ben Brooks, Steve Marshall filed by Harold David Cruise. (ON THE WRONG FORM) - Ref to MJ/Milling (PSU) (tgw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 1983 COMPLAINT against Ben Brooks, Steve Marshall filed by Harold David Cruise - Ref to MJ/Milling (PSU) (tgw)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order directing Plaintiff by 1/28/2019 to file this Court's forms for a 1983 complaint & Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/28/2018. Copy of Order, 1983 complaint & IFP motion mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
December 12, 2018 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold David Cruise (FILED IN ALND AT DOC. 2) - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (PSU) (tgw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 7:18-cv-1906-ACA-JEO. Documents numbered 1-3, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (PDF IS BOOKMARKED) - Ref to MJ/Milling (PSU) (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruise v. State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ben Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold David Cruise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?