Childress v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jeramie Michael Childress
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00531
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Office of the General Counsel. Acknowledgement filed by Jeramie Michael Childress. (Lassiter, Byron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. Acknowledgement filed by Jeramie Michael Childress. (Lassiter, Byron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeramie Michael Childress. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/26/2018, answer due 3/26/2019. (Lassiter, Byron)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/20/18. (tot)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill (SSA, U.S. Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny) (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2321715, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jeramie Michael Childress. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Atty, #2 Summons - U.S. Atty General, #3 Summons - OGC) (Lassiter, Byron) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/20/2018) (tot). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/20/2018) (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramie Michael Childress
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?